Karim, Shahzad Saleem (CPSO#: 61225)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1991