Karimi Zandi, Shahram (CPSO#: 83287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahram K. Zandi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karimi Zandi ( CPSO# 83287 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 716-3092

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRAM KARIMI ZANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIMI ZANDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Jan 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011