Karkouti, Keyvan (CPSO#: 62344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 3 Eaton N
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keyvan Karkouti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Karkouti ( CPSO# 62344 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3 Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEYVAN KARKOUTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARKOUTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991