Karmali-Rawji, Shameela (CPSO#: 65185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level Suite A6
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4C 1C3
Phone: (905) 407-1806
Fax: 8777787787
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karmali-Rawji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karmali-Rawji ( CPSO# 65185 )

Business Address:
East York Medical Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Lower Level Suite A6
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 01 Dec 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMEELA KARMALI-RAWJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARMALI-RAWJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993