Karpilow, Craig (CPSO#: 85959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Feb 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Fax: (905) 526-9745
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Karpilow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Karpilow ( CPSO# 85959 )

Business Address:
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone Number: (905) 526-9744

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Indiana
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Craig  Karpilow  may  practise  medicine independently in family medicine,
            only. 

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)