Karram, Joshua Jeremy (CPSO#: 107096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave.,
E-Main Room EM-206, Box 227
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA JEREMY KARRAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KARRAM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. KARRAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KARRAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KARRAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KARRAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KARRAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018