Karsli, Cengiz Han (CPSO#: 66525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karsli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Karsli ( CPSO# 66525 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
The Hospital for Sick Children
Suite 2211
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CENGIZ HAN KARSLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998