Karson, Stanley John (CPSO#: 50888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: Kasprzak, Stanley John (used until: 21 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9292 Highway 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Phone: (705) 526-0057
Fax: (705) 526-1537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karson ( CPSO# 50888 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Street
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
9292 Highway 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Phone Number: (705) 526-0057

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY JOHN KARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983