Karthikeyan, Surianarayanan (CPSO#: 61605)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 08 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1996