Kashin, Brian Arthur (CPSO#: 55755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6582
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 Finch Ave West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3560 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Kashin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kashin ( CPSO# 55755 )

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ARTHUR KASHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986