Kashour, Tarek Seifaw (CPSO#: 64406)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2003