Kashtan, Hillel Isaac (CPSO#: 50887)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: Kashitan, Hillel Isaac (used until: 26 Feb 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000