Kasianik, Larissa (CPSO#: 85737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Khabarovsk State Medical Institute, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201QueenStreet ( formerly 44Queen
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6752
Fax: (866) 588-4130
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kasianik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kasianik ( CPSO# 85737 )

Business Address:
Kincardine Community Medical Clinic
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6752

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISSA KASIANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASIANIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008