Kasmani, Tahseen Shakoor (CPSO#: 96896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202, 6212 Main Street
Whitchurch- Stoufville
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone: 905-591-4969
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHSEEN SHAKOOR KASMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASMANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2014 to 03 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016