Kasperavicius, Mykolas Lee (CPSO#: 100498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 5237100
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Rd.
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-0210
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.L. Kasperavicius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kasperavicius ( CPSO# 100498)

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
163 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 945-3695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYKOLAS LEE KASPERAVICIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASPERAVICIUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2015