Kasrai, Leila (CPSO#: 68235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 707
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 236-5559
Fax: (416) 236-9722
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leila Kasrai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kasrai ( CPSO# 68235 )

Business Address:
Suite 707
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 236-5559

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Suite 1524
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEILA KASRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASRAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2000