Kass, Malek (CPSO#: 80509)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2004 to 21 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2010