Kassam, Amin Bardai (CPSO#: 64134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Health Care
St Lukes Medical Centre
Suite 630
2801 West Kinninkinnic River Pkwy
Milwaukee WI  53215
United States
Phone: (414) 385-7111
Fax: (414) 385-1899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN BARDAI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1992