Kassam, Fatma-Zahra Amirali (CPSO#: 81573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Radiation Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital
7th Floor, Hydro Building
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416 946-2936
Fax: 416 946-4442
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Naraghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kassam ( CPSO# 81573 )
Dr. A. Naraghi ( CPSO# 81445 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3MC421
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 23 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATMA-ZAHRA AMIRALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 05 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009