Kassam, Saleem Amirali (CPSO#: 66466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saleem Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kassam ( CPSO# 66466 )

Business Address:
Suite 200A
1105 Kingston Road
Pickerel ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
410 - 325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health Centre
Centenary
Suite 307
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEEM AMIRALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997