Kassam, Salma (CPSO#: 63936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gates of Maple Family Practice
201- 955 Major Mackenzie Dr. W.
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 417-7899
Fax: (905) 417-8905
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salma Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kassam ( CPSO# 63936 )

Business Address:
Gates of Maple Family Practice
201 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-7899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMA KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2006