Kassam, Yasmin Badrudin (CPSO#: 30923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi, Swahili

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMIN BADRUDIN KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1979