Kassas, Emad (CPSO#: 89909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone: (519) 255-9991
Fax: (519) 255-7086
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Kassas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kassas ( CPSO# 89909 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 971-2901

Business Address:
3rd Floor
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Emad  Kassas  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Paediatrics  and
            Neonatology, only.