Kassel, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 52809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3575
Fax: (905) 721-6640
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert N. Kassel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kassel ( CPSO# 52809 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL KASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985