Kassim, Muna Abdullah A (CPSO#: 101880)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2014