Kassim, Olayiwola Adesina (CPSO#: 50889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Center
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3830
Fax: (705) 773-4633
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ola Kassim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kassim ( CPSO# 50889 )

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 838-7121

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLAYIWOLA ADESINA KASSIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)