Kassirian, Shima (CPSO#: 77942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: (905) 773-3515
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shima Kassirian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kassirian ( CPSO# 77942 )

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIMA KASSIRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSIRIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007