Kassis, Jeannine (CPSO#: 61818)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015