Kassum, Shamina (CPSO#: 87035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013