Kasten, Sydney Lewis (CPSO#: 16820)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011