Kasza, Leslie Andre (CPSO#: 56203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cedars Professional Park
2937 66 Street NW
Edmonton AB  T6K 4C1
Phone: (780) 461-6802
Fax: (780) 450-0621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANDRE KASZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985