Katarynych, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 105187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTHONY KATARYNYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATARYNYCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017