Katchen, Debra Lynn (CPSO#: 53905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Mansfield, Debra Lynn (used until: 21 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holly Medical Clinic
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.L. Katchen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Katchen ( CPSO# 53905 )

Business Address:
Holly Medical Clinic
611 Holly Avenue
Suite 103
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0086

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN KATCHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATCHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2014