Kates, Martin Lawrence (CPSO#: 28399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apartment 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Kates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kates ( CPSO# 28399 )

Business Address:
Apartment 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN LAWRENCE KATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976