Kathirgamanathan, Kalaimakal (CPSO#: 86740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON  L5K2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kathirgamanathan ( CPSO# 86740 )
Dr. I. Wong ( CPSO# 79154 )

Business Address:
Suite 2106
5955 Veterans Memorial Lane
halifax NS  B3H 2E1
Phone Number: (902) 473-7626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALAIMAKAL KATHIRGAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHIRGAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012