Kathuria, Chanchal (CPSO#: 86059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 16
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693-9500
Fax: (905) 693-8600
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sangeet Kathuria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathuria ( CPSO# 83468 )
Dr. C. Kathuria ( CPSO# 86059 )

Business Address:
Suites 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779


Corporation Name: Chanchal Kathuria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathuria ( CPSO# 83468 )
Dr. C. Kathuria ( CPSO# 86059 )

Business Address:
Suite 16
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 693-9500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANCHAL KATHURIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHURIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 17 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2010