Kathuria, Sangeet (CPSO#: 83468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 11-12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: 9054977707
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sangeet Kathuria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathuria ( CPSO# 83468 )
Dr. C. Kathuria ( CPSO# 86059 )

Business Address:
Suites 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 5K7
Phone Number: (905) 497-7779


Corporation Name: Chanchal Kathuria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kathuria ( CPSO# 83468 )
Dr. C. Kathuria ( CPSO# 86059 )

Business Address:
Suite 16
585 Ontario Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2N2
Phone Number: (905) 693-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 24 Jan 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGEET KATHURIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHURIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2005 to 26 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009