Katib, Yasir Abdulhameed Mohammed (CPSO#: 75439)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007