Katiraee, Babak (CPSO#: 104559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 21 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Centro Occidental Lisandro Alvarado, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Miminal Access Surgery
Department of Surgery
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35144
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BABAK KATIRAEE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KATIRAEE is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KATIRAEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KATIRAEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KATIRAEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KATIRAEE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KATIRAEE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Aug 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018