Kato, Atsuko (CPSO#: 102361)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nagoya City University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2013 to 16 Feb 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017