Katsios, Zaharo (CPSO#: 63496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Oxford Street East
Suite 200
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 858-4476
Fax: (519) 858-8199
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Katsios Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Katsios ( CPSO# 63496 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 858-4476

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHARO KATSIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992