Katsuno, Richard Martin (CPSO#: 55505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
172 Ethel Street
Unit 1A
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone: (705) 753-5352
Fax: (705) 753-6729
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Katsuno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Katsuno ( CPSO# 55505 )

Business Address:
172 Ethel Street
Unit A
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-5352

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 21, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notification from West Nipissing General Hospital of the partial and temporary suspension of Dr. Richard Katsuno's privileges. Specifically, Dr. Katsuno's admitting privileges were temporarily suspended for the periods of January 21 -- January 24, 2013, May 8 -- May 14, 2013 and December 6 -- December 10, 2013.

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MARTIN KATSUNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSUNO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987