Katsuta, Tsuyoshi (CPSO#: 62537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Enhanced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8W 0A2
Phone: (416) 354-2640
Fax: (647) 729-2008
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lawrence Warden Medical Centre
2050A Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-2207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TSUYOSHI KATSUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSUTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1991