Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Katta, Balaraju Bhagavan (CPSO#: 68514)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004