Katyal, Deepak (CPSO#: 68682)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997