Katyal, Parul (CPSO#: 81855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parul Katyal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Katyal ( CPSO# 81855 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARUL KATYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 04 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010