Katyal, Sonia (CPSO#: 80729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3471 Lake Shore Blvd West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 1N2
Phone: (647) 352-5533
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Newnham Campus
1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 2X5
Canada
Phone: 416-491-5050
Fax: 416.491.5050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA KATYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006