Katz, Abraham Simon (CPSO#: 25169)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Katz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: a) Don Mills Surgical Unit or b) St. Michael's Hospital
Date Received: 11 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017