Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Katz, Arnon Moshe (CPSO#: 58300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 836-1454
Fax: (905) 836-1585
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Katz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Katz ( CPSO# 58300 )

Business Address:
304 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 836-1454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNON MOSHE KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988