Katz, Ian (CPSO#: 54310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western Pennsylvania Orthopaedics
And Sports Medicine
2 Celeste Drive
Johnstown PA  15905
United States
Phone: (814) 255-6781

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1985